Trustees THE NATIONAL AUTISTIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 269425
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Stephen John Ladyman Chair 27 November 2021
None on record
Alastair Mark Damon Gilmartin Smith Trustee 01 February 2024
None on record
Rachel Bowden Trustee 01 February 2024
None on record
Julian Scholefield Trustee 14 December 2023
None on record
Pamela Marie Marsden Trustee 19 July 2023
INFOCUS CHARITY
Received: On time
John Hilton Roscoe Trustee 14 October 2022
None on record
Hooman Eskisi Wordsworth Trustee 14 October 2022
None on record
Zahaan Bharmal Trustee 14 October 2022
None on record
George Henry Davidson Trustee 27 November 2021
None on record
Sheila Margaret Anne Norris Trustee 27 November 2021
None on record
Olga Frances Clayton Trustee 27 November 2021
None on record
Edward Joseph Caddle Trustee 10 December 2020
None on record
Helen Roberts Trustee 03 October 2019
None on record
Elisa Maria Rita Menardo Trustee 28 July 2016
None on record
DR David Alan Reeves Trustee 28 July 2016
None on record