GREYHOUND TRUST

Charity number: 269668
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £4.14m £4.58m £3.87m £3.48m £3.35m
Total expenditure £3.63m £3.80m £3.21m £3.32m £2.84m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £96.77k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.71m £2.34m £1.88m £1.47m £2.12m
Income - Other trading activities £40.46k £4.22k £17.71k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £932.18k £861.75k £544.88k £2.01m £1.24m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.40k £37.99k £26.75k £0 £0
Income - Other £1.45m £1.40m £1.30m £0 £0
Income - Legacies £706.00k £1.33m £928.74k £300.87k £759.29k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.49m £3.69m £2.98m £3.18m £2.76m
Expenditure - Raising funds £139.64k £109.45k £233.23k £137.80k £78.78k
Expenditure - Governance £2.40k £4.00k £4.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0