Financial history MILLFIELD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 269754
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £42.23k £47.47k £37.23k £38.13k £27.53k
Total expenditure £35.07k £32.46k £42.15k £37.42k £39.45k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £17.26k