ESSEX POLICE SUPPORT STAFF BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 269890
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £5.08k £4.93k £4.51k £4.92k £5.45k
Total expenditure £4.30k £4.34k £6.65k £3.84k £4.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A