Accounts and annual returns WHEATHAMPSTEAD COMMUNITY GROUP

Charity number: 269899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 08 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 11 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 11 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2019 11 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 28 June 2019 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 29 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required