Accounts and annual returns THE ISLES OF SCILLY MUSEUM ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 270055
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 14 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 07 January 2020 68 days late
Annual return 31 December 2017 27 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 27 September 2018 On time
Annual return 31 December 2016 22 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 21 June 2017 On time