HYMNS ANCIENT AND MODERN LIMITED

Charity number: 270060
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 13 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 13 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 04 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 04 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 02 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 02 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 10 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 10 March 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2015 26 January 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 26 January 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)