Friends of Hatcham College

Charity number: 270297
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £2.02k £1.68k £4.32k £4.26k £3.11k
Total expenditure £794 £1.39k £1.72k £2.66k £1.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A