Trustees TANZANIA DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 270462
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JANET CHAPMAN Chair 25 November 2015
None on record
Dr Sheila Farrell Trustee 02 February 2022
None on record
PAUL JAMES HARRISON Trustee 30 October 2021
THE CCG TRUST
Received: On time
Aikande Clement Kwayu Trustee 24 October 2020
None on record
Jeremy Lefroy Trustee 04 March 2020
THE YARLET TRUST
Received: On time
THE DONALD MACKAY TRUST
Received: On time
THE MYCRO TRUST
Overdue by 115 days
THE BUCKE COLLINS CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT
Received: On time
THE RELATIONSHIPS FOUNDATION
Received: 3 days late
STAFFORD AND DISTRICT CARERS HOLIDAY TRUST
Received: On time
CONCORDIS INTERNATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
STAFFORDSHIRE HISTORY DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time
STAFFORD WORKS
Received: On time
IVCC
Received: On time
Global Coalition for Youth Employment
Received: On time
Community Foundation for Staffordshire and Shropshire
Received: On time
THE TRAIDCRAFT FOUNDATION
Received: 99 days late
FRIENDS OF THE GUILDHALL, NEWCASTLE UNDER LYME
Received: On time
CAFE AFRICA TRUST
Received: On time
MR Jonathn Pace Trustee 25 November 2015
None on record
DAVID GIBBONS Trustee 27 October 2011
ACTION AND COMPASSION FOR TANZANIA
Received: On time