HERTFORD SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 270513
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £32.02k £39.28k £31.51k £38.92k £23.36k
Total expenditure £30.98k £38.06k £32.27k £39.00k £24.48k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £500 £1.00k N/A