Financial history HENRY WOOD HALL LIMITED

Charity number: 270689
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £378.74k £359.76k £415.90k £372.00k £249.23k
Total expenditure £387.27k £380.80k £415.97k £410.35k £442.65k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £26.44k