Trustees HENRY WOOD HALL LIMITED

Charity number: 270689

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID BURKE Trustee 14 December 2020
LONDON PHILHARMONIC ORCHESTRA LIMITED
Received: On time
ENGLISH TOURING OPERA LIMITED
Received: On time
Martin Reinhard Hohmann Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record
Anne Margaret Rushton Trustee 06 August 2019
None on record
Laurence Johnstone Watt Trustee 26 July 2019
None on record
David Peter Jackson Trustee 01 June 2019
None on record
James Lennox Mackenzie Trustee 01 April 2019
THE LONDON SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA ENDOWMENT TRUST
Received: On time
Barry Wordsworth Trustee 15 December 2015
None on record
Antony Lewis-Crosby Trustee 12 December 2014
None on record
KATHRYN ALEXANDRA MCDOWELL Trustee 10 January 2012
THE LONDON SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA LIMITED
Received: On time
THE LONDON SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA ENDOWMENT TRUST
Received: On time