Financial history THE ANCASTER TRUST

Charity number: 270822
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £733.20k £91.84k £92.94k £92.95k £90.47k
Total expenditure £113.93k £123.59k £133.04k £100.83k £79.19k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £654.34k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £78.85k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £102.55k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £6.94k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £11.97k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £6.94k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £4.44k N/A N/A N/A N/A