Financial history HEATHERSIDE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 270851
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £54.32k £52.96k £53.94k £53.40k £24.98k
Total expenditure £50.18k £49.54k £50.26k £56.99k £38.16k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k N/A N/A £2.23k £5.77k