COOPERS COBORN PARENTS' ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 270893
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £23.13k £33.15k £58.35k £31.14k £23.57k
Total expenditure £19.72k £18.65k £41.17k £40.90k £50.78k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A