Financial history ST LEONARDS AND ST IVES VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 270967
Charity reporting is overdue by 24 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £78.99k £51.41k £57.61k £68.90k £60.86k
Total expenditure £54.61k £69.84k £59.73k £60.90k £66.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £16.00k £10.50k £8.00k £45.14k £22.00k