5TH NEWQUAY SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 271112
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 13 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 27 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 08 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 20 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required