5TH NEWQUAY SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 271112
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £20.45k £19.56k £15.49k £22.00k £13.61k
Total expenditure £18.30k £12.53k £20.96k £9.46k £11.06k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £500 £10.00k £8.00k