ANGMERING VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 271149
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £32.52k £32.45k £36.38k £34.45k £28.50k
Total expenditure £36.10k £25.45k £34.30k £32.19k £22.56k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £750 N/A £1.20k £10.00k