Accounts and annual returns STANLEY PICKER TRUST

Charity number: 271185
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 25 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 25 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 23 March 2021 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 23 March 2021 46 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 04 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 04 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 04 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 04 February 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 02 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 02 February 2018 On time Download Open in new window