Financial history STANLEY PICKER TRUST

Charity number: 271185
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £78.98k £100.22k £122.23k £144.84k £176.92k
Total expenditure £473.07k £493.42k £422.34k £405.38k £349.90k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £25.00k