8TH LETCHWORTH SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 271198
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 07 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 07 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 27 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 27 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 11 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 11 September 2017 On time Download