Trustees ACE NURSERY SCHOOL (CAMBRIDGE) LIMITED
Charity number: 271233
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hanna Barbara Ochalik-Baca | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
William Newhouse | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Orla Lynskey | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Salman Mohammad | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Agnes Payne | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Richens | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Elizabeth Robarts | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rene Oosthuysen | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Julia Rebecca Forman | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ariana Lucia Katrin Rees-Roberts | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Lucy Eccles | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Florin Mircea Iliescu | Trustee | 11 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Begona Carod Alonso | Trustee | 11 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jan-Caspar Rebling | Trustee | 12 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
LISA ELAINE TUOHY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.