THE AURELIUS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 271333
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £86.40k £86.27k £94.26k £98.28k £94.62k
Total expenditure £111.33k £103.87k £110.77k £113.94k £116.73k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A