THE WOLLASTON HERITAGE SOCIETY

Charity number: 271530
Charity reporting is up to date (22 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021
Total gross income £6.32k £7.20k £6.44k £9.46k £23.57k
Total expenditure £4.75k £10.13k £5.78k £5.17k £15.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £10.00k