Financial history LONDON TOPOGRAPHICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 271590
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £50.99k £32.58k £35.84k £33.30k £54.90k
Total expenditure £33.85k £30.57k £32.43k £45.88k £32.99k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A