TRIRATNA BUDDHIST COMMUNITY (WEST LONDON)

Charity number: 271591
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £155.80k £194.90k £206.09k £204.70k £246.06k
Total expenditure £221.95k £213.08k £209.86k £232.44k £283.22k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A