TRIRATNA BUDDHIST COMMUNITY (WEST LONDON)

Charity number: 271591
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sean Quigley Trustee 16 September 2019 None on record
Carol-Anne Bois Trustee 12 September 2020 None on record
Marilyn Therza Trustee 20 November 2017 None on record
Wendy Young Chair 31 July 2013
TRIRATNA CHAIRS' ASSEMBLY Received: On time
HANA DILLEY Trustee 08 October 2019 None on record
David Sampson Trustee 21 January 2019 None on record
MR VILASAMANI KIRKPATRICK Trustee None on record