POOLE HISTORICAL TRUST

Charity number: 271603
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021
Total gross income £8.20k £5.76k £8.69k £7.46k £4.70k
Total expenditure £5.81k £6.18k £8.55k £5.94k £4.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A