THE DECORATIVE ARTS SOCIETY 1850 TO PRESENT

Charity number: 271838
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 20 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 18 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 18 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 08 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 08 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 01 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 01 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 27 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 27 January 2017 On time Download