Governing document TRIRATNA BUDDHIST COMMUNITY (NORWICH)
Charity number: 272024
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1ST AUGUST 1976 AMENDED 16TH FEBRUARY 1977 7TH NOVEMBER 1977 22ND OCTOBER 1981 AND 11TH NOVEMBER 1986 ALSO AMENDED 10TH MARCH 1997, APRIL 1998 AND 22 FEBRUARY 2010
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE BUDDHIST RELIGION.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NORWICH
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.