FRIENDS OF QUEEN MARY`S HOSPITAL FOR CHILDREN

Charity number: 272058
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.02k £2.80k £1.48k £7.40k £1.78k
Total expenditure £11.05k £10.71k £6.44k £9.41k £10.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A