Financial history WOODLEY LIGHT OPERATIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 272166
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £20.40k £20.30k £20.14k £2.51k £13.11k
Total expenditure £16.81k £19.20k £22.03k £1.43k £16.44k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A