Accounts and annual returns ST MARTINS SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 272330
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 24 April 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 24 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 03 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required