Governing document ENGLISH SPEAKING BOARD (INTERNATIONAL) LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/07/1976 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/04/1986 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/04/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/03/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/03/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24 JUN 2017 as amended on 18 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ENGLISH LANGUAGE AND ENGLISH LITERATURE AND IN PARTICULAR IN ENGLISH AS A SPOKEN LANGUAGE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.