Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ST PETER'S AND ST GILDA'S

Charity number: 273048
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £32.66k £29.32k £21.46k £10.51k £7.76k
Total expenditure £29.79k £24.26k £6.81k £3.10k £300
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A