Accounts and annual returns THE ALICE ELLEN COOPER-DEAN CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 273298
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 24 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 24 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 22 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window