Governing document LEXDEN SPRINGS APPEAL FUND
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18/10/1977 AS AMENDED ON 22/04/1980 AS AMENDED ON 23/03/1982 AS AMENDED ON 05/03/2008 AS AMENDED ON 12/01/2012 AS AMENDED ON 18/04/2013 as amended on 14 May 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND GENERAL WELFARE OF THE PUPILS AT LEXDEN SPRINGS SCHOOL COLCHESTER BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION, RECREATION AND GENERAL WELFARE AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY)
Area of benefit
COLCHESTER
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.