THE MEHER BABA ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 273632
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Celia Barbara Freije Trustee 24 October 2015 None on record
HAVOVI VISTASP MAHALUXMIWALA Trustee 09 October 2011 None on record
OM PRAKASH VASUDEVA Trustee None on record
Sally Manders Trustee 27 July 2019 None on record
PAUL QUENTIN BIRCHARD Chair 17 March 2018 None on record
TANYA DIERDRE MOLLER Trustee None on record
JAMES DAVID LEE Trustee 10 December 2012 None on record
RICHARD JOHN CORK Trustee 02 October 2013 None on record
ERNEST ALFRED SAUNDERS Trustee 27 January 2018 None on record
SUE CHAPMAN Trustee 02 October 2013 None on record
LAWRENCE JAMES BENBOW Trustee 10 December 2012 None on record