RADIO CHELSEA AND WESTMINSTER

Charity number: 273836
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.20k £2.60k £2.83k £3.33k £1.08k
Total expenditure £2.90k £1.65k £2.26k £3.38k £1.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A