BETTENHURST CHARITY LIMITED

Charity number: 274013
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £282.22k £273.86k £432.44k £838.93k £401.14k
Total expenditure £104.49k £157.04k £198.10k £476.60k £778.12k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £562.59k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £273.74k N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £2.59k N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £458.07k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £18.53k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £12.05k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £446.02k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £18.53k N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A