Financial history 1ST ICKENHAM SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 274112
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £35.66k £27.93k £26.06k £28.59k £11.40k
Total expenditure £28.73k £16.89k £17.23k £21.63k £10.27k
Income from government contracts £7.88k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £10.00k