Trustees 1ST ICKENHAM SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 274112
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stephen William Hurst Chair 30 September 2017
None on record
Callum Moore Trustee 17 October 2021
None on record
Kirsty Gibbs Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Geoff Vanderplank Trustee 01 July 2018
None on record
JACQUELINE ELIZABETH SMITH Trustee 22 July 2013
None on record
Robert Brown Trustee 08 June 1986
None on record
MARGARITA LEWIS Trustee
None on record
KEITH LEWIS Trustee
None on record
JOHN ARNOLD Trustee
None on record