Financial history THE YOUNG FOUNDATION

Charity number: 274345
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £5.32m £2.41m £1.77m £1.81m £1.90m
Total expenditure £3.47m £3.21m £2.37m £2.02m £2.13m
Income from government contracts £95.94k £194.11k £212.33k £368.28k £312.18k
Income from government grants £775.06k £293.61k £10.94k £5.57k £410.48k
Income - Donations and legacies £3.86k £0 £0 £125.00k £1.14k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £214.99k £187.25k
Income - Charitable activities £3.58m £2.22m £1.57m £1.47m £1.71m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £10.04k £8.63k £7.38k £6.98k £2.42k
Income - Other £1.72m £181.35k £197.77k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.14k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.47m £3.21m £2.37m £2.02m £2.13m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £28.50k £27.65k £24.49k £24.37k £37.65k
Expenditure - Grants institution £371.94k £328.03k £139.59k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0