Dogfen lywodraethu BROADWAY HOMELESSNESS AND SUPPORT
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/02/1977 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/07/1977 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/10/1986 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/10/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/02/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/04/1998 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09/10/2012 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 11/03/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 NOV 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE PROVISION OF TEMPORARY AND PERMANENT SOCIAL HOUSING (AS DEFINED IN SECTION 68 OF THE HOUSING AND REGENERATION ACT 2008) AND OF SUPPORT AND CARE, FOR THE RELIEF OF POOR, AGED, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, OR CHRONICALLY SICK PEOPLE, AND OF SERVICES WHICH PREVENT PEOPLE BECOMING HOMELESS, WHICH ALLEVIATE HOMELESSNESS AND WHICH HELP PEOPLE RECOVER FROM HOMELESSNESS; AND ANY OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE PROVIDED SUCH PURPOSE CAN BE CARRIED OUT BY A CHARITY REGISTERED AS A PROVIDER OF SOCIAL HOUSING WITH THE HOMES AND COMMUNITIES AGENCY OR ANY STATUTORY SUCCESSOR.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.