ST LUKE'S SCHOOL PARENT-TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 274460
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 September 2021 220 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 10 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 May 2018 111 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 30 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required