Financial history ACTIONAID

Charity number: 274467
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £60.41m £55.04m £49.60m £49.11m £50.31m
Total expenditure £58.62m £60.90m £46.61m £50.58m £49.13m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £27.57k N/A £2.27k
Income from government grants £4.88m £2.09m £716.99k £1.09m £1.19m
Income - Donations and legacies £41.15m £40.22m £39.17m £38.61m £39.25m
Income - Other trading activities £11.00k £18.00k £3.05m £3.31m £3.05m
Income - Charitable activities £19.17m £14.64m £7.33m £7.10m £7.60m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £78.00k £162.00k £46.00k £91.00k £95.34k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £316.20k
Income - Legacies £1.88m £1.79m £2.72m £2.28m £3.72m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £49.30m £51.74m £36.29m £39.28m £37.44m
Expenditure - Raising funds £9.32m £9.16m £10.31m £11.30m £11.69m
Expenditure - Governance £410.00k £488.00k £541.00k £453.00k £141.70k
Expenditure - Grants institution £41.13m £43.99m £30.26m £31.72m £30.29m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0