Accounts and annual returns ST THOMAS MORE PARENTS AND TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 274518
Charity reporting is overdue by 329 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2022 Overdue Overdue by 329 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Overdue Overdue by 329 days
Annual return 31 October 2021 24 March 2023 205 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 30 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 30 March 2021 211 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 02 January 2020 124 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required