Financial history REGINALD AUGUSTUS EDWARD HENESY WILL TRUST

Charity number: 274525
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £28.45k £20.29k £7.51k £2.89k £3.72k
Total expenditure £29.72k £14.68k £3.35k £3.95k £1.46k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A