HOW WOOD SCHOOL PARENT-TEACHERS' ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 274545
Charity reporting is overdue by 485 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2014 31/07/2015 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018
Total gross income £7.80k £6.27k £8.05k £8.20k £9.55k
Total expenditure £8.56k £7.76k £3.26k £6.12k £11.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A